Trustees THE TREE HOUSE CHILDREN'S CENTRE
Charity number: 1142850

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Collette Corinna Tait | Chair | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Leon Casbourne | Trustee | 03 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kimberley Jacklin | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anastasija Sweetman | Trustee | 11 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Becky Bailey | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
KATIE ELIZABETH WATERSON | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.