Trustees CODNOR SPORTS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1142223
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Wolverson Trustee 02 December 2024
None on record
Susan Lorraine Wolverson Trustee 02 December 2024
None on record
Councillor Mark Howard Trustee 26 June 2022
None on record
David Wood Trustee 03 August 2021
None on record
Michael Neale Trustee 03 August 2021
None on record
Mick Day Trustee 01 February 2015
None on record
GARY JOHNSON Trustee 04 February 2013
None on record
COUNCILLOR Christopher Emmas-Williams Trustee 06 September 2012
None on record
PHILIP MOSS Trustee
None on record