Financial history HAVERFORDWEST/PEMBROKESHIRE STROKE CLUB

Charity number: 1143078
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2017 04/04/2018 04/04/2019 04/04/2020 04/04/2021
Total gross income £2.37k £1.41k £5.72k £3.05k £2.13k
Total expenditure £4.27k £2.85k £3.48k £3.39k £1.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A