Financial history MADRASSA TALIM-UL-QURAN

Charity number: 1139818
Charity reporting is overdue by 455 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £65.62k £63.91k £34.74k £30.27k £41.02k
Total expenditure £51.88k £50.18k £25.04k £30.45k £26.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A