Trustees FRIENDS OF GARRICK GREEN
Charity number: 1139753
Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne May Moore | Chair | 04 October 2010 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin John King | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Loretta Suzanne Elizabeth Harper | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Strowger | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kelsey Bardwell | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Magdalena Siwiec | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynsey Clare Eagle | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Taylor | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Genevieve Penelope Gammage | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Louise Pink | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Corina Raluca Arsene | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Jane Abel | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Louise Lakey | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colleen Girling | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Sarah Mary Louise Cunningham | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jade Nicolette Mcdonald | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Jane Smalley | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Louise Hall | Trustee | 04 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Louise Dewing | Trustee | 19 October 2010 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Janet Banner | Trustee | 19 October 2010 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.