Trustees ASHOVER BRASS BAND
Charity number: 1142475
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Louise Archibald | Chair | 03 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
TOBIAS WILLIAM NICOLAS BRADLEY | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Freeman | Trustee | 03 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
SALLY BINGHAM | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
John William Surguy | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL PAULINE HAMMOND | Trustee | 06 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
David Freeman | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TREVOR DURHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.