Accounts and annual returns TRANSFORMATION FOUNDATION KENT

Charity number: 1139625
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2012 21 November 2013 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2011 14 December 2012 167 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 Not Required