Financial history EXMOUTH GATEWAY CLUB

Charity Number: 1145306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £54.83k £45.59k £62.51k £72.41k £83.77k
Total expenditure £65.44k £47.95k £52.89k £80.49k £82.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A