Accounts and annual returns THE MCKINNEY ROGERS FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1140251
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2017 31 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 31 January 2018 On Time
Annual return 30 April 2016 25 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 25 January 2017 On Time