Financial history LIFE FOR AFRICAN MOTHERS

Charity number: 1140183
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £179.05k £248.67k £123.96k £118.74k £88.49k
Total expenditure £174.51k £78.28k £154.76k £141.08k £164.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £18.40k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £24.00k £18.40k