Accounts and annual returns THE FORGOTTEN ONES
Charity number: 1139871
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2015 | 13 April 2017 | 195 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2015 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window