Accounts and annual returns SMALLWOOD CE PRIMARY SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1140450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 September 2023 21 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2022 09 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2021 27 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2020 01 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 September 2019 01 April 2021 274 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2019 Not Required