Financial history KNOTTY ASH COMMUNITY TRANSPORT

Charity Number: 1140229
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £650.06k £701.10k £692.14k £884.63k £898.61k
Total expenditure £604.10k £681.11k £759.15k £890.67k £840.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £868.15k N/A
Income from government grants £35.26k N/A £15.96k £16.48k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £898.61k
Income - Charitable activities £650.06k £701.10k £692.14k £884.36k £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £604.10k £681.11k £759.15k £890.67k £0
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £2.35k £2.35k £2.74k £2.99k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £840.10k