Accounts and annual returns ASSOCIATION FOR SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT IN ETHIOPIA

Charity number: 1140456
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 29 August 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 20 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 05 August 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required