Financial history PADDOCK CRICKET, BOWLING AND ATHLETIC CLUB

Charity number: 1141920
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £194.55k £101.53k £22.55k £18.46k £206.73k
Total expenditure £193.47k £100.51k £28.67k £23.11k £199.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £39.07k £4.00k N/A N/A