Financial history NORTHDALE HORTICULTURE

Charity number: 1142535
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £837.19k £855.99k £1.20m £1.44m £1.32m
Total expenditure £728.65k £791.14k £974.10k £1.19m £1.32m
Income from government contracts £557.38k £614.29k £713.48k £884.65k £998.63k
Income from government grants £57.32k £96.26k N/A £500 £20.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £32.13k £68.47k £335.53k £371.06k £83.27k
Income - Other trading activities £5.63k £0 £2.24k £1.26k £3.25k
Income - Charitable activities £658.76k £694.87k £856.80k £1.07m £1.23m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £270 £258 £717 £1.79k £2.77k
Income - Other £138.10k £92.38k £3.14k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £250.00k £281.00k £30.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £715.62k £778.53k £959.35k £1.18m £1.31m
Expenditure - Raising funds £13.03k £12.61k £14.75k £15.98k £17.30k
Expenditure - Governance £12.68k £5.66k £10.57k £18.50k £11.66k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0