Accounts and annual returns EMPLOYMENT LAW CENTRES

Charity number: 1143250
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 October 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 01 October 2014 29 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2014 29 July 2015 On Time
Annual return 01 October 2013 02 July 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2013 31 July 2014 On Time
Annual return 01 October 2012 04 April 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2012 Not Required