Accounts and annual returns SILVER RING THING UK

Charity Number: 1142267
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2014 22 December 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2014 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2013 23 December 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2013 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2012 30 January 2013 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2012 Not Required