Accounts and annual returns CHAOS THEORY

Charity Number: 1141485
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2023 03 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 03 November 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 23 May 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 August 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 July 2020 On Time