Accounts and annual returns THE CHARLIE MORTIMER FUND

Charity number: 1145715
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 24 April 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 28 March 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required