Financial history Hillfields Church Coventry

Charity number: 1141725
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £218.06k £262.79k £206.70k £247.64k £259.80k
Total expenditure £236.74k £265.08k £198.92k £285.78k £288.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A