Financial history SHINEWATER SHAFTESBURY CENTRE TRUST

Charity number: 1142003
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £73.31k £36.74k £36.74k £0 £0
Total expenditure £71.13k £83.31k £46.57k £1.04k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.00k £4.00k £1.31k N/A N/A