Financial history STARFISH SERVICES LIMITED

Charity number: 1146237
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £345.44k £274.96k £297.07k £301.32k £169.61k
Total expenditure £352.58k £300.10k £374.51k £305.87k £185.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £13.40k N/A