Accounts and annual returns WOMEN'S AWARENESS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1144852
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 07 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 07 May 2021 281 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 31 July 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required