Trustees NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF STUDENT MONEY ADVISERS
Charity number: 1142415

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kellie McAlonan | Chair | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon Griffiths | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shahida Ahmed | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Keay | Trustee | 17 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE MILES | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Einir England | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Reid | Trustee | 17 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Forsey | Trustee | 17 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Lockhart | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma-Jane Quirke | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.