Financial history LET THEM SHINE

Charity Number: 1142281
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.73k £11.14k £19.41k £22.57k £23.69k
Total expenditure £16.90k £9.47k £18.12k £13.65k £17.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A