Governing document THE CAXTON FOUNDATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUSTDEED TRUST DEED DATED 30/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 17/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 25/11/2011 AS AMENDED ON 21/03/2012
Charitable objects
5.1 THE OBJECTS ARE: 5.1.1 TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND OTHER BENEFITS TO MEET ANY CHARITABLE NEED OF: A) INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE RECEIVED BLOOD, BLOOD PRODUCTS OR TISSUES FROM THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE AND IN CONSEQUENCE HAVE BEEN INFECTED WITH THE HEPATITIS C VIRUS; AND B) AN INDIVIDUAL WHO HAS BEEN SO INFECTED BY A PERSON IN 5.1.1(A); EACH OF WHOM HAS RECEIVED A STAGE 1 PAYMENT OTHER THAN EXCLUDED PERSONS (TOGETHER CALLED "PRIMARY BENEFICIARIES"); AND C) THE PARTNERS, PARENTS, CARERS, CHILDREN AND DEPENDANTS OF PRIMARY BENEFICIARIES AND THE PARTNERS, PARENTS, CARERS, CHILDREN AND DEPENDANTS OF PRIMARY BENEFICIARIES WHO HAVE DIED; AND D) THE PARTNERS, PARENTS, CARERS, CHILDREN AND DEPENDANTS OF ANY OTHER INDIVIDUALS WHO DIED BEFORE 29 AUGUST 2003 AND WHOSE ESTATES HAVE, FOR THE REASONS GIVEN IN SCHEDULE 5, RECEIVED A PAYMENT UNDER THE SKIPTON FUND AGREEMENT (2); AND 5.1.2 TO ASSIST THE MACFARLANE TRUST AND THE EILEEN TRUST BY PROVIDING THEM WITH ACCOMMODATION, ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES AND SUPPORT. 5.2 FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE: 5.2.1 A "PARTNER" IS A HUSBAND OR WIFE, A WIDOW OR WIDOWER, A CIVIL PARTNER OR A CO-HABITEE OF A PRIMARY BENEFICIARY (INCLUDING, WHERE APPLICABLE, A PARTNER FROM WHOM A PRIMARY BENEFICIARY IS OR WAS DIVORCED, SEPARATED OR HAS AN ORDER FOR DISSOLUTION); AND 5.2.2 A "CARER" IS A RELATION OF A PRIMARY BENEFICIARY WHO HAS PROVIDED NURSING OR SIMILAR CARE ON TERMS OTHERWISE THAN FOR FULL CONSIDERATION IN MONEY OR MONEY'S WORTH AND IN CONSEQUENCE HAS SUFFERED FINANCIALLY AND/OR IN THEIR HEALTH. 5.2.3 "CHILDREN" INCLUDES STEP CHILDREN. 5.3 THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE THE POWER, WITH THE CONSENT OF THE FOUNDER, TO ADD INDIVIDUALS TO THE CLASS OF PRIMARY BENEFICIARIES AND TO ALTER THE DEFINITION OF "EXCLUDED PERSONS". 5.4 FOR THE AVOIDANCE OF DOUBT CLAUSE 5.1.2 SHALL NOT EXTEND TO THE DIRET FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND OTHER BENEFITS TO EXCLUDED PERSONS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.