Financial history LEEDS ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity number: 1142605
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £224.09k £212.84k £383.04k £353.89k £456.24k
Total expenditure £179.17k £163.22k £250.54k £286.18k £293.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A