Financial history THE BAMFORD SHEEP DOG TRIALS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 501880
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £2.52k £737 £7.35k £9.42k £8.32k
Total expenditure £3.91k £1.30k £7.14k £8.57k £11.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A