Accounts and annual returns TREES GIVE LIFE

Charity Number: 1142703
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 20 September 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 31 December 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 29 May 2012 On Time