Financial history THE NEWNHAM CLUBROOM

Charity Number: 1142129
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/04/2020 06/04/2021 06/04/2022 06/04/2023 06/04/2024
Total gross income £48.95k £32.00k £14.46k £9.04k £12.99k
Total expenditure £38.33k £22.88k £9.84k £5.12k £16.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £10.00k N/A N/A N/A