Financial history THE INVICTA FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1143326
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2012 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016
Total gross income £17.14k £62.77k £72.31k £50.63k £301.58k
Total expenditure £12.84k £62.73k £69.78k £42.18k £218.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0