Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF GORSEINON AND GARNGOCH HOSPITALS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 501907
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2006 19 July 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 19 July 2007 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2005 25 July 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 26 September 2006 58 days late
Annual return 30 September 2004 16 August 2005 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2004 Not Required