Accounts and annual returns BREATHE ON UK

Charity number: 1143785
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2019 08 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 02 May 2019 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 05 September 2018 189 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required