Financial history FIRST STEP PRE SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 1142554
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £173.28k £170.52k £164.67k £195.02k £219.19k
Total expenditure £155.57k £136.47k £171.96k £188.08k £217.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £156.68k £151.66k £138.05k £169.47k £190.04k