Financial history VICTORIA ISLAMIC CULTURAL & EDUCATION CENTRE (VICEC)

Charity number: 1143987
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/03/2018 15/03/2019 15/03/2020 15/03/2021 15/03/2022
Total gross income £53.40k £37.82k £2.24k £8.10k £3
Total expenditure £59.85k £42.91k £1.20k £375 £285
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A