Accounts and annual returns ANGLIA RUSKIN STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1145952
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2017 14 May 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 19 May 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required