Accounts and annual returns BATHTUB 2 BOARDROOM

Charity number: 1144236
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2016 06 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2015 30 August 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2015 30 August 2016 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2014 29 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 29 July 2015 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2013 31 July 2014 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 31 July 2014 1 days late