Financial history NOUR

Charity number: 1144213
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 16/06/2020 16/06/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £61.59k £196.13k £60.62k £162.05k £250.82k
Total expenditure £32.46k £128.84k £72.83k £162.79k £215.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £170.79k N/A £82.33k N/A