Trustees AUGUSTINIANS OF THE ASSUMPTION
Charity number: 1143432

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev RICHARD ANDREW JOSEPH O'BRIEN | Chair | 07 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Alex Castro | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pierre Cao Ba Vinh | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Br Quoc Cuong Tran | Trustee | 19 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fr Viktors Jermakovics | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fr Erik Samson | Trustee | 23 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Fr Justin Kasereka | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev DIDIER REMIOT | Trustee | 25 February 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.