Accounts and annual returns SKEET HILL HOUSE MANAGEMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1143339
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2017 14 May 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 14 May 2018 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2016 04 May 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 04 May 2017 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2015 26 April 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 26 April 2016 On Time