Accounts and annual returns NONSUCH HIGH SCHOOL PARENTS AND TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1143169
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 17 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 14 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 18 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required