Trustees COVENTRY SHRI SIDHI VINAYAGAR DEVASTHANAM
Charity number: 1144183

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kanapathipillai Sittambalam | Chair | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thambipillai Kajenthiran | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Appathurai Suntharesan | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Subramaniam Kirupaharan | Trustee | 16 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Balasubramaniam Kumarathas | Trustee | 16 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
PERANANTHAM SELLATHAMBY | Trustee | 20 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kandiah SELVARATNAM | Trustee | 07 November 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.