Accounts and annual returns CHORLEY FITNESS

Charity number: 1143706
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2018 15 May 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 15 May 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2017 08 May 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 May 2018 On Time