Accounts and annual returns CHIPPING ONGAR PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1144277
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 29 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 24 September 2023 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 31 July 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 28 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 16 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required