Trustees SHEFFIELD PARENT CARER FORUM
Charity number: 1145913
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Mottram | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Carr | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Wilson | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joel Hardwick | Trustee | 20 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julie Chambers | Trustee | 08 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
LAURA GILLESPIE | Trustee | 14 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
CLARE PECK | Trustee | 15 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
JAYNE WOODWARD | Trustee | 15 September 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.