Accounts and annual returns HYLTON CASTLE AND TOWN END FARM BOY'S CLUB

Charity number: 502239
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required