Financial history BRENTFORD HIGH STREET STEERING GROUP

Charity number: 1144408
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017
Total gross income £33.07k £19.70k £25.76k £17.67k £16.68k
Total expenditure £37.02k £39.58k £23.97k £21.55k £14.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0