Financial history HOLY ANGELS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1144592
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £184.48k £208.34k £172.89k £212.39k £258.59k
Total expenditure £161.58k £172.44k £172.52k £209.06k £232.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A