Accounts and annual returns YOUNG PERSONS POSITIVE MOVES EXTRAS

Charity number: 1144974
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 04 April 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 04 April 2016 30 March 2017 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2016 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2015 03 December 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2015 Not Required